Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLovelace v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Nevada
CityLas Vegas
Case Number2:2022cv00766
Date Filed2022-05-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jennifer A. Dorsey
PlaintiffTiwanda Lovelace
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice FBI
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-16Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-161MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Tiwanda Lovelace. (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Mandamus, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JQC) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-162Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Petitioner Tiwanda Lovelace. (JQC) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-163ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-06-094EXHIBIT to 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Tiwanda Lovelace. (JQC) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-115MOTION to Correct 4 Exhibit by Petitioner Tiwanda Lovelace. Responses due by 6/25/2022. (JQC) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/14/2022) (JQC). (Entered: 06/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar