Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWRIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01378
Date Filed2022-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCHRIS WRIGHT
Case DescriptionChris Wright, a blogger, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning adverse reactions to the covid vaccines. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and referred the request to the Centers for Disease Control, which indicated the request fell within the unusual circumstances category. Wright then asked the CDC for expedited processing and the agency provided some records. However, Wright argued that his request was meant to be sent to all HHS components not just CDC. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wright filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (HHS)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [14]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202185) filed by CHRIS WRIGHT. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztth) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-18SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztth) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-06-212NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-213Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-21MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and Defendant shall answer or respond to the Complaint on or before July 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/21/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/21/2022, (tj) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-07-214Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-21MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall answer or respond to the Complaint on or before July 28, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/21/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/19/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/18/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/03/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/2/2022 (zjm) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-07-286MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-287Order advising plaintiff to respond to 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Response due by 8/29/2022. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/28/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-298Memorandum in opposition to re 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by CHRIS WRIGHT. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(ztth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2022: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ztth). (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-029MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-02MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall file its Reply in support of its motion to dismiss on or before September 13, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/2/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-1310REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2022)
2022-10-1411NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney DAN SCHAEFER (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-11-0412NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christina O'Tousa on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney T. Anthony Quinn (O'Tousa, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-12-3013ORDER denying 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12-30-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/30/2022)
2022-12-3014MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12-30-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar