Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01437
Date Filed2022-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Center to Advance Security in America submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning a July 2021 memo suggesting that the Afghan government would collapse shortly after U.S. troops pulled out of Afghanistan. CASA requested a fee waiver for each request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CASA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9255817) filed by CENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOS Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty Summons, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 13)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-25Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmh) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-06-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/2/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/2/2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General June 7, 2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/2/2022 (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-07-056NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-057ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-06MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 07/06/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-218Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the 8 Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by August 10, 2022, including, if necessary, a proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 07/25/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-08-109Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by October 11, 2022, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/11/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar