Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01471
Date Filed2022-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records that discuss or describe Monitoring Plans in force for the period of September 1, 2019 through September 28, 2021 in Wyoming. AWHC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-251COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9262725) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Malone, Sean) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-27Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zjm) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-06-013STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/1/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar