Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01473
Date Filed2022-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning the number of borrower defense claims covering a specific period. NSLDN also requested a fee waiver for each request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted NSLDN's requests for fee waivers. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-251COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9262972) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to DC USAO, # 3 Summons to U.S. Department of Education, # 4 Summons to USAG)(Elson, Alexander) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/27/2022) (zjm). Modified on 5/27/2022 to replace fillable cover sheet (zjm). (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjm) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-06-013STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/1/2022. (lcrdm1) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/1/2022 to correct typo in case number.) (zkt). (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/3/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/3/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/3/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 6/3/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Elson, Alexander) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 6/7/2022.) (ztnr) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar