Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMaritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd. v. U.S. Maritime Administration
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv04308
Date Filed2022-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John G. Koeltl
PlaintiffMaritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd.
Case DescriptionThe Maritime Legal Aid and Advocacy, Ltd. submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Maritime Administration for records concerning sexual abuse on merchant ships. MLAA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MLAA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Maritime Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-251COMPLAINT against U.S. Maritime Administration. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26197272)Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Original FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Agency Acknowledgment of FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit Denial of Expedited Treatment).(Melogy, John) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-252FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melogy, John) Modified on 5/26/2022 (vf). (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-253RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd...(Melogy, John) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-254FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Maritime Administration, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd...(Melogy, John) Modified on 5/26/2022 (vf). (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Ryan Melogy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd., United States Maritime Administration. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Ryan Melogy to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; Civil Cover Sheet is not signed; Form Caption not provided. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Ryan Melogy to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the FOIA Summons Form; Defendant party name error. Defendant party name listed on Summons and Summons Caption does not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-265CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melogy, John) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-266FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. MARITIME ADMINISTRATION, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd...(Melogy, John) Modified on 5/26/2022 (vf). (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-267FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - BLANK SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. MARITIME ADMINISTRATION, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd...(Melogy, John) Modified on 5/26/2022 (vf). (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-268REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. MARITIME ADMINISTRATION, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd...(Melogy, John) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-269ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Maritime Administration. (vf) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-06-02Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 8/11/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-0510AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Maritime Administration served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affirmation Re: U.S. Attorney General).(Melogy, John) (Entered: 06/05/2022)
2022-06-0511AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Maritime Administration served on 6/2/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit US Attorney Affirmation of Service, # 2 Affidavit USA SDNY Affirmation of Service).(Melogy, John) (Entered: 06/05/2022)
2022-06-0812AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit U.S. Attorney General Affidavit of Service, # 2 Affidavit Delivered USA for SDNY Affidavit of Service).(Melogy, John) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-2013FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against U.S. Maritime Administration.Document filed by Maritime Legal Aid & Advocacy, Ltd.. Related document: 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: MLAA DE Franchise Tax Report 2021, # 2 Exhibit B: FOIA Request No1, # 3 Exhibit C: Request No1 Acknowledgment, # 4 Exhibit D: Request No1 1st Partial Response, # 5 Exhibit E: Request No1 2nd Partial Response, # 6 Exhibit F: FOIA Request No2, # 7 Exhibit G: Request No2 Acknowlegement, # 8 Exhibit H: Request No2 Expedited Processing Denial, # 9 Exhibit I: FOIA Request No3, # 10 Exhibit J: Request No3 Acknowledgement, # 11 Exhibit K: Request No3 1st Partial Response, # 12 Exhibit L: FOIA Request No4, # 13 Exhibit M: Request No4 Acknowledgment).(Melogy, John) (Entered: 06/20/2022)
2022-06-2914NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of U.S. Maritime Administration..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-2915CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 13 Amended Complaint,,, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lucas Issacharoff dated 6/29/2022. Document filed by U.S. Maritime Administration..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-3016ORDER granting 15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 13 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lucas Issacharoff dated 6/29/2022. 1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. U.S. Maritime Administration answer due 7/27/2022. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/30/2022) (ate) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-2717ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by U.S. Maritime Administration..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-07-2918ORDER: The parties should submit a status report by August 12, 2022. The conference scheduled for August 11, 2022 is canceled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/28/2022) (ks) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-1119JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lucas Issacharoff dated 8/11/2022 re: Status. Document filed by U.S. Maritime Administration..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-1120MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 19 Letter filed by U.S. Maritime Administration ENDORSMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/11/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar