Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01489
Date Filed2022-05-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning waivers or impartiality determinations allows senior officials to ethics policies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9265823) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- FOIA 2021-HQFO-00991, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- DHS GC)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-272SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-313ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/31/2022. (DM) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-07-014NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of All Defendants (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-015ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-056ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer and file a joint status report by SEPTEMBER 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/5/22. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2022. (zalh) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-08-257Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-25MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report. Defendant indicates that it has completed its search for records potentially responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request and has located 60 pages of potentially responsive records. Defendant has sent certain potentially responsive records to the White House and to "other DHS offices" for "further consultation." As to the records sent to other DHS offices, Defendant anticipates making a production of non-exempt responsive records by October 15, 2022. As to the records sent to the White House, Defendant indicates that it will be able to provide a further update to the Court in the next status report. As proposed by the parties, the Court ORDERS to the parties to file a further joint status report on or before OCTOBER 25, 2022, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and, if appropriate, proposing a schedule for proceeding in the case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/25/22. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2022, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and, if appropriate, proposing a schedule for proceeding in the case. (dot) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar