Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJames V. Lacy et al v. United States Department of State
DistrictCentral District of California
CitySouthern Division - Santa Ana
Case Number8:2022cv01065
Date Filed2022-05-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David O. Carter
PlaintiffJames V. Lacy
PlaintiffUnited States Justice Foundation
Case DescriptionJames Lacey and the United States Justice Foundation submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning communications pertaining to Hunter Biden. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency assigned all three requests to the complex track. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Lacey and the United States Justice Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of State
DefendantDoes 1 through 10, inclusive
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-261COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33370341 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff James V. Lacy, United States Justice Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Attorney Chad D Morgan added to party James V. Lacy(pty:pla), Attorney Chad D Morgan added to party United States Justice Foundation(pty:pla))(Morgan, Chad) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-262Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff James V. Lacy, United States Justice Foundation. (Morgan, Chad) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-263CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James V. Lacy, United States Justice Foundation. (Morgan, Chad) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-264CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs James V. Lacy, United States Justice Foundation (Morgan, Chad) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-265CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Morgan, Chad) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-276NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-277NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-278Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-27930 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant United States Department of State. (car) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-06-0210INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-08-3011MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/9/2022. (twdb) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-3112PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James V. Lacy, United States Justice Foundation, upon Defendant United States Department of State served on 8/11/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Crystal Veloz, Legal Assistant. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Morgan, Chad) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-09-0613STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of State answer now due 10/12/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of State.(Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party United States Department of State(pty:dft))(Casselman, Jill) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar