Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01497
Date Filed2022-05-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted two FOIA requests to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning communications sent to or from four SEC officials that were also sent to four White House officials. EPA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-271COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9267048) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to US Attorney, US Attorney General, and SEC, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-292NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 5/31/2022.) (ztnr) (Entered: 05/29/2022)
2022-05-31Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-314STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/31/22. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-275NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Alexandra Verdi on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-276MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's 6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Government shall now respond to the 1 Complaint on or before July 25, 2022. The Parties are directed to Paragraph 9(A) of the Court's 4 Standing Order requiring motions for extension of time to be filed at least four days prior to the first affected deadline. Future extension requests that do not comply with this rule will be disfavored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/27/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/25/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-07-217ANSWER to Complaint by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-21MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before August 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/21/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/22/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-228Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file another Joint Status Report on or before September 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/22/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
2022-09-219Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 9 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS the parties to file another Joint Status Report on or before October 21, 2022 updating the Court on the status of this case and proposing a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/21/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar