Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKoch et al v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv04421
Date Filed2022-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jed S. Rakoff
PlaintiffWilliam I. Koch
PlaintiffBradley Goldstein
Case DescriptionWilliam Koch, who collects rare wines, and Bradley Goldstein, who writes about wines, submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning the deceased wine counterfeiter Meinhard Gorke. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Koch and Goldstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-281COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26211378)Document filed by William I. Koch, Bradley Goldstein..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 05/28/2022)
2022-05-282FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clopper, John) Modified on 5/31/2022 (pc). (Entered: 05/28/2022)
2022-05-283REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 05/28/2022)
2022-05-284STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-3712 (PAE). Document filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 05/28/2022)
2022-05-31***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Clopper. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Clopper to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Origin was not selected. Jurisdiction was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 22cv3712. (pc) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-315ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(pc) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-316CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-02CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 22-3712 and declined by Judge Paul Engelmayer and returned to wheel for assignment. (aea) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-02NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-02Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (aea) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-097NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 7-5-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 7/5/2022 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/9/22) (yv) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-288INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 06/28/2022)
2022-06-299NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-07-0110ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/5/2022, (Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2022 at 05:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The public may access this proceeding by dialing :USA toll free 888-363-4735, international caller paid 215-446-3657, Access code 1086415. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The dial in information remains the same as previously posted.. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/22/2022. Court's decision: Defense proposed discovery schedule by letter due Monday July 25, 2022 by 5:00pm ltd to 5 single spaced pages.Plaintiffs proposed discovery schedule by letter due by Tuesday July 26, 2022 by 5:00pm,ltd to 5 single spaced pages. Government may file a 3 page single spaced letter responding to plaintiffs submission with any other items they wish to bring up by noon on Wednesday July 27, 2022, Plaintiff may file a 3 page single spaced letter responding to government's submission with any other items they wish to bring up by noon on Wednesday July 27, 2022. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-2811LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Stephen Cha-Kim dated July 25, 2022 re: letter letter requesting to provide documentation. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(ks) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-2812LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from John D. Clopper dated July 26, 2022 re: Koch response letter. Document filed by William I. Koch..(ks) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-2813LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Stephen Cha-Kim dated July 27, 2022 re: Reply letter from FBI. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(ks) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-2814LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from John D. Clopper dated July 27, 2022 re: Reply letter from Koch. Document filed by William I. Koch..(ks) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-2915ORDER: Accordingly, the Court orders the parties to proceed in the following manner: The FBI shall produce non-exempt information from the above-stated categories of documents, as set out in its July 25, 2022 letter, including those records referred to other agencies, by no later than October 28, 2022. If upon receipt of the FBI's production plaintiffs wish to pursue their request for a broader subset of the approximately 13,000 responsive pages identified by the agency, the Court will hear their application to do so at that time. Absent such an application, the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment by November 30, 2022. Answering papers shall be served by December 14, 2022, and reply papers by December 28, 2022. A final pre-trial conference, as well as oral argument on any summary judgment motions, shall be held on January 4, 2023. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 11/30/2022. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/29/2022) (kv) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-0916TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/22/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2022..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
2022-08-0917NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/22/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
2022-09-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2022, without transcription or recording. John Clopper of Bond, Schoeneck & King for plaintiff and Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim for the Government were present. The Governments request for an extension of time to produce responsive records is granted in part; the Government is granted a 45-day extension, until 12/12/22. No further extensions will be granted. Absent an application for the production of a broader set of documents, the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment by 1/13/23. Answering papers shall be due by 1/27/23. Reply papers shall be due 2/10/22. The final pretrial conference currently set for 1/4/23, as well as oral argument on any summary judgment motions, shall be held on February 22, 2023 at 4:30 PM. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar