Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01516
Date Filed2022-05-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffCHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE
Case DescriptionThe Chinese American Legal Defense Alliance submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning the Chinese Initiative. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. CALDA narrowed its request to emails to and from DOE from the Department of Justice and the FBI. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CALDA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-301COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9269647) filed by CHINESE AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOE, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAO-DC, # 5 Exhibit Ex 1., # 6 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 10)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/30/2022)
2022-06-02Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zmh) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/10/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/10/2022. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/10/2022. (See docket entry 3 to view document). (zjm) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-06-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 6/9/2022 (See docket entry 3 to view document). (zjm) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar