Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01529
Date Filed2022-05-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning communications between NARA officials and the Trump White House, including the transfer of records found at Mar-a-Lago to NARA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency responded that each request fell into the unusual circumstances category and would take further time to process. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-311COMPLAINT against U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9272360) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons NARA Summons)(Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-312LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 6/22/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/10/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2022.) (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-07-115NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Joseph Wynosky on behalf of U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Wynosky, Kevin) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-116ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Wynosky, Kevin) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before July 25, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/11/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-257Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 31, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/25/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-08-318Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wynosky, Kevin) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before 10/21/2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/31/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar