Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01549
Date Filed2022-06-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning email communications of four FERC officials to or from three outside email domains belonging to two activist groups over the course of seven months. IER also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged the receipts and consolidated them into a single request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-021COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9276349) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to USAO, USAG, and FERC)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-033NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 6/6/2022) (ztnr). (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-304NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-305Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/5/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-286ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-29MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/29/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-027Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/3/2022. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-10-038Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar