Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01550
Date Filed2022-06-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning FOIA requests received by FERC over a two-week period and the agency's replies or responses to those requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-021COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9276352) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to USAO, USAG, and FERC)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-022NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. Case related to Case No. 1:22-cv-1549. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-034NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Main Document 4 flattened and replaced on 6/6/2022) (ztnr). (Entered: 06/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar