Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01563
Date Filed2022-06-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning the delegation of authority from the Secretary of Transportation to other officials in the department. PPT also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9278309) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA OST-2022-0103, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Department of Transportation General Counsel)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-03Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zjm) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-033STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 3, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-294NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-295Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 5 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time and DIRECTING defendant to respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by August 5, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 29, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/5/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-08-056ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-197Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by January 13, 2023, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 19, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/13/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar