Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWebb v. Office of Management & Budget (OMB) et al
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityRichmond
Case Number3:2022cv00418
Date Filed2022-06-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge David J. Novak
PlaintiffMajor Mike Webb
doing business as Friends for Mike Webb (C00591537)
also known as Major Mike Webb for Congress (H8VA08167)
doing business as Major Mike Webb for APS Board
DefendantOffice of Management & Budget (OMB)
DefendantMETA Platforms, Inc.
also known as Facebook, Inc.
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-031MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint (RECEIVED), # 2 Complaint - Substitution (RECEIVED), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 83.1(M) Certification, # 5 Praecipe - summons, # 6 Envelope)(asho, ) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-062ORDER (Denying Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Ordering Particularized Complaint) The Court finds that Plaintiff is not qualified to proceed in forma pauper is and, therefore, the Court hereby DENIES the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF no. 1 ). The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the required filing fee by June 27, 2022. The Court has reviewed the Complaint and finds that it does not satisfy Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. It is hereby ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a particularized amended complaint that outlines in simple and straightforward terms why Plaintiff thinks that he is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over this case, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a)(l) and (2). Once filed, the particularized amended complaint will become the operative complaint in this case. The failure to strictly comply with the Court's directive and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL of this action for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (b ). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS AND DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 6/6/2022. A copy of this Order sent electronically to all counsel of record and a copy sent to Plaintiff at his address of record as directed. (asho, ) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-273NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL From Order to Amend and Denying Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Major Mike Webb. (jpow, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-284Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 3 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (smej, ) (Entered: 06/28/2022)
2022-06-28Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re 3 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (smej, ) (Entered: 06/28/2022)
2022-06-29USCA Case Number 22-1698, Case Manager J. Neal, for 3 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Major Mike Webb. (smej, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar