Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLIAMS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01528
Date Filed2022-05-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffTERRELL A. WILLIAMS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. CENSUS BUREAU
DefendantU.S. CENSUS BUREAU Philadelphia Regional Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-27Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/27/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-05-271COMPLAINT against U.S. CENSUS BUREAU(Philadelphia Regional Office), U.S. CENSUS BUREAU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE filed by TERRELL A. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Appendix Consent) (zjf). (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-05-272MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TERRELL A. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(zjf) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall randomly assign this case to a district judge for further proceedings. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 17, 2022. (psu1) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-06-21Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-30MINUTE ORDE: It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the Clerk of Court shall issue summonses and shall cause service of process to be effected by the United States Marshals Service on the Defendant, the United States Attorney General, and the United States Attorney for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/30/22. (psu2) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-09-303SUMMONS (5) Issued as to U.S. CENSUS BUREAU(Philadelphia Regional Office), U.S. CENSUS BUREAU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar