Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTIN v. GARLAND et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01594
Date Filed2022-05-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDONALD LYNN MARTIN
DefendantMERRICK GARLAND in his Official Capacity as Attorney General of the United States
DefendantMERRICK B. GARLAND in his Official Capacity as Attorney General of the United States
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-31Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/31/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-05-311COMPLAINT against MERRICK GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by DONALD LYNN MARTIN. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-05-312MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONALD LYNN MARTIN. (znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-05-313PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DONALD LYNN MARTIN (znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-104ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $43.37 from Prison Account of DONALD LYNN MARTIN and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 06/10/2022. (znmg) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-10Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-135SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MERRICK GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (znmg) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-07-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/14/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/13/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/14/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MERRICK GARLAND served on 7/14/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/14/2022 (znmw) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-057ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/5/22. (DJS) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-088NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of MERRICK GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-099First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MERRICK GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
2022-08-09MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' 9 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and the Answer or other response the 1 Complaint is due by September 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/9/22. (psu2) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
2022-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/14/2022. (tb) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-08-1210MOTION to Compel Discovery by DONALD LYNN MARTIN. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibits)(znmw) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-2512Memorandum in opposition to re 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by DONALD LYNN MARTIN. (znmw) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-3011Memorandum in opposition to re 10 Motion to Compel Discovery filed by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-1413Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-2014Order advising Plaintiff to respond by 10/14/2022 to 13 Defendants' Partial MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/22. (psu2) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-2015ORDER denying 10 Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/22. (psu2) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-2216MOTION for Entry of Default by DONALD LYNN MARTIN. (zjm) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/14/2022. (tb) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar