Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA)
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01602
Date Filed2022-06-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Sparacino, which represents military servicemembers and their families who were killed or injured because of Iranian support for terrorism in Iraq, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Central Command concerning records of 298 servicemembers, who were injured or killed by terrorists in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt off the request and asked Sparacino to modify its request. Sparacino did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sparacino filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-061COMPLAINT for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA) ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9287650) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons to U.S. Central Command J6-RDF, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney's Office - Civil Process Clerk, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPARACINO PLLC (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-07Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (znmg) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-304NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas M.H. Reddick on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Reddick, Nicholas) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/5/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-305NOTICE of Appearance by Devin Charles Ringger on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Ringger, Devin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/5/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-306NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ryan on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Ryan, Timothy) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/5/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-308RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/13/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-309RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. served on 6/13/2022 UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael); Modified text on 7/1/2022 at the request of counsel (ztth). (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-0710NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-1411Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA). (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-18MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant must respond to the 1 Complaint by July 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 18, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-2812ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA).(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by August 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 4, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-1813Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA). (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-2214SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall file a joint status report on October 18, 2022. See document for more details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 22, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar