Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKAPLAN v. NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01604
Date Filed2022-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJONATHAN KAPLAN
Case DescriptionJournalist Jonathan Kaplan submitted two FOIA requests to the National Geospatial Intelligence Agency for records concerning the reprisal report filed with the NGA's Office of Inspector General as part of the investigation of Kaplan's whistleblowing activities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kaplan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-071COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9288832) filed by JONATHAN KAPLAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Schulz, David) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-072NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JONATHAN KAPLAN. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-03306. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-08Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JONATHAN KAPLAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-07-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 6/13/2022 (Schulz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/16/2022. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/9/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/9/2022. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-117NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-118ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-12MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 8/26/22. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/12/22. (DJS) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2022. (tb) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-08-269Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-29MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' 9 Joint Status Report , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by October 26, 2022 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the parties propose a change in to status quo, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/29/2022. (lcac) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Report due by 10/26/2022. (tb) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar