Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. UNITED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01614
Date Filed2022-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Trade Commission for records concerning the agency's investigation of anti-consumer behavior by oil and gas companies in response to a memo from President Biden. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located 116 responsive pages but withheld them entirely under Exemption 5 (privileges). FGI filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency agreed that it had not performed an adequate search and remanded the request for further processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-071COMPLAINT FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE against FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE UNTED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9289900) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: COMPLAINT FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE against FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE UNTED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9289900) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet 22-cv-01614, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Letter from President Biden to Commissioner Kahn 11.17.2111.17.21., # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter from NEC Director Deese to FTC Commissioner Kahn 8.11.21, # 4 Exhibit Ex# 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet 22-cv-01614, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Letter from President Biden to Commissioner Kahn 11.17.2111.17.21., # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter from NEC Director Deese to FTC Commissioner Kahn 8.11.21, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - FOIA request from FGI to FTC 1.3.22, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Letter from FTC Denying FGI's FOIA 3.10.22, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -FGI's FOIA appeal 3-23-2022, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Letter from FTC to FGI Regarding FGI'hibit 3 - FOIA request from FGI to FTC 1.3.22, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Letter from FTC Denying FGI's FOIA 3.10.22, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -FGI's FOIA appeal 3-23-2022, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Letter from FTC to FGI Regarding FGI's Appeal, # 8 Summons Summons - FTC c/o U.S. Att. Gen., # 9 Summons Summons - FTC c/o U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 10 Summons Summons - FTC General Counsel)(Goeken, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2022) (znmg).s Appeal, # 8 Summons Summons - FTC c/o U.S. Att. Gen., # 9 Summons Summons - FTC c/o U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 10 Summons Summons - FTC General Counsel)(Goeken, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2022) (znmg). Modified on 6/8/2022 to replace fillable civil cover sheet (znmg). (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-072ERRATA Correcting Caption in Complaint to Reflect Defendant's Address by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Caption In Complaint Adding Defendant's Street Address)(Goeken, Richard) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-08Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-084STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 8, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-07-065NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-146Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by UNITED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before August 22, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 14, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-08-217ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/21/2022)
2022-08-22MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to meet and confer and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before September 6, 2022. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 22, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-09-068Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file another joint status report on or before October 13, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 7, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar