Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01617
Date Filed2022-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionGun Owners of America submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the creation of the Disinformation Governance Board. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gun Owners of America filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-071COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9290419) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-073LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-08NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to stephen@sdslaw.us, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, ) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-084ERRATA by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-09Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmh) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-095SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-096STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 9, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/16/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/16/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/21/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/16/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof on US Atty CPC, # 2 Exhibit Proof on DHS, # 3 Exhibit Proof on AG)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-07-188NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-189ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-18MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiffs' FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before August 8, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 18, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-2010NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jeffrey Olson on behalf of GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-2711Joint STATUS REPORT by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-07-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 7, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 28, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-09-0712Joint STATUS REPORT by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
2022-09-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 4, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 9, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/09/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar