Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGHASSAN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01615
Date Filed2022-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffOMAR GHASSAN Dr.; PhD
Case DescriptionDr. Omar Ghassan submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the agency's use of assassinations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ghassan.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202284) filed by OMAR GHASSAN.(znmw) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-07SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-092STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/9/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-153ORDER: To ensure compliance with Rule 4(m), it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant in the manner required by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before September 5, 2022. If Plaintiff fails to serve Defendant and to file proof of service with the Court by September 5, 2022, and if he does not show "good cause" for an extension of time to effect service on or before September 5, 2022, the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/15/2022. (lcrdm2) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/16/2022 to correct typo) (kt). (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-07-054MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by OMAR GHASSAN. (zjm) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order, Dkt. 4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as premature. On June 15, 2022, the Court issued an order directing Plaintiff to serve Defendant pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Dkt. 3 . The defendant in this action has not yet been served, however. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, the Court "may issue a temporary restraining order without written or oral notice to the adverse party or its attorney" only if "(A) specific facts in an affidavit or a verified complaint clearly show that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result to the movant before the adverse party can be heard in opposition; and (B) the movant's attorney certifies in writing any efforts made to give notice and the reasons why it should not be required." Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1). Here, Plaintiff has failed to offer any justification for proceeding prior to serving Defendant. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/7/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-105NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2022)
2022-07-226MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion for extension of time, Dkt. 6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before September 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/26/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-09-157MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Quinn, Thomas). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 9/15/2022 (zjm). (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-188FOX/NEAL ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss, Dkt. 7 , on or before October 14, 2022. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/18/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 09/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar