Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVoice of San Diego et al v. Veterans Health Administration et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2022cv00833
Date Filed2022-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael M. Anello
PlaintiffVoice of San Diego
PlaintiffWill Huntsberry
Case DescriptionWill Huntsberry, a reporter with the Voice of San Diego, submitted a FOIA request to the Veterans Health Administration for records concerning audits or reports on Volunteers of America Southwest. Huntsberry also requested inclusion in the media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed two documents with redactions under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Huntsberry filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Voice of San Diego filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantVeterans Health Administration
DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-081COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16894962.), filed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) The new case number is 3:22-cv-833-MMA-AGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Burke, Thomas)(alns) (jms). (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-082Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (alns) (jms). (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-083NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Will Huntsberry, Voice of San Diego re 1 Complaint, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Burke, Thomas) QC mailer sent re: document missing case number in caption (tcf). (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-07-014SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. Department of Veterans Affairs served. (MacLaren, Selina) (tcf). (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-015SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. Veterans Health Administration served. (MacLaren, Selina) (tcf). (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-116ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration.(Boutelle, Betsey)Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party Department of Veterans Affairs(pty:dft), Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party Veterans Health Administration(pty:dft) (fth). (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-127ORDER (AGS): On August 18, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. the Court will hold a Case Management Conference by way of Zoom videoconference. The Court will send a Zoom link to all counsel of record before the hearing. By August 11, 2022, the parties must file a joint case plan outlining a proposed schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/12/2022.(no document attached) (mxa) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-08-118NOTICE of Joint Case Plan by Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration re 7 Set Hearings, (Boutelle, Betsey) (tcf). (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-189MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): On August 18, 2022, the Court held a Case Management Conference. By September 21, 2022, defendant must complete its response to plaintiffs' FOIA request. An Early Neutral Evaluation order will issue separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 08/18/2022. (CD# 8/18/2022 AGS 13:00-13:15). (no document attached) (mxa) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-1810NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference is set for 10/25/2022 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/18/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-09-3011Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans Health Administration. (Boutelle, Betsey) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar