Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVoice of San Diego et al v. Naval Criminal Investigative Service et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2022cv00834
Date Filed2022-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Todd W. Robinson
PlaintiffVoice of San Diego
PlaintiffWill Huntsberry
Case DescriptionVoice of San Diego reporter Will Huntsberry submitted a FOIA request to the Naval Criminal Investigative Service for records concerning the agency's investigation of the deaths of 20 named individuals between 2020 and 2021. Huntsberry also requested inclusion in the media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency indicated that 14 investigations had been completed and could be disclosed. Huntsberry asked NCIS to provide the records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Huntsberry filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNaval Criminal Investigative Service
DefendantU.S. Department of the Navy
DefendantU.S. Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-081COMPLAINT Against Naval Criminal Investigative Service, U.S. Department of the Navy, U.S. Department of Defense (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16895116.), filed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-02/02/22 Initial Response, # 3 Exhibit B-04/27/22 NCIS Response) The new case number is 3:22-cv-834-BTM-RBB. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Burke, Thomas)(cxt) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-082Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-083NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Will Huntsberry, Voice of San Diego re 1 Complaint, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Burke, Thomas) (sjt). (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-224**DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 5 ** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Party with Financial Interest served on U.S. Department of Justice on June 14, 2022, filed by Voice of San Diego. (MacLaren, Selina) (QC mailer sent re: wrong event selected. Atty instructed to withdraw and refile) (sjt). Modified to withdraw on 6/27/2022 (sjt). (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-245NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Will Huntsberry, Voice of San Diego re 4 Affidavit of Service, filed by Voice of San Diego . (MacLaren, Selina) (sjt). (Entered: 06/24/2022)
2022-06-296SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. Naval Criminal Investigative Service served. (MacLaren, Selina)(jms). (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-297SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. Naval Criminal Investigative Service served. (MacLaren, Selina) (jms). (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-07-018SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. U.S. Department of Defense served. (MacLaren, Selina)(sjt). (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-019SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. U.S. Department of Defense served. (MacLaren, Selina) (sjt). (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-0110SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. U.S. Department of the Navy served. (MacLaren, Selina) (sjt). (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-0111SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. U.S. Department of the Navy served. (MacLaren, Selina) (sjt). (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-1112MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Naval Criminal Investigative Service, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of the Navy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karen Richman)(Boutelle, Betsey)Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party Naval Criminal Investigative Service(pty:dft), Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party U.S. Department of Defense(pty:dft), Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party U.S. Department of the Navy(pty:dft) (sjt). (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-2613MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv834-BEN-RBB.(no document attached) (sjt) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-2814MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 22cv834-TWR-RBB.(no document attached) (ddf) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-2815AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C Section 552, et seq. against Naval Criminal Investigative Service, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of the Navy, filed by Voice of San Diego, Will Huntsberry. (Burke, Thomas) (fth). (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-1116ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint, by U.S. Department of the Navy, U.S. Department of Defense, Naval Criminal Investigative Service.(Boutelle, Betsey)(ave). (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-1117ORDER Resetting Hearing - re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Naval Criminal Investigative Service, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of the Navy, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2022 01:30 PM before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 8/11/2022.(ave) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-1118ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, and Denying as Moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss - denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 8/11/2022. (ave) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-1519NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/27/2022 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2022 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 8/15/2022. (fth) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-2220Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by Naval Criminal Investigative Service, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of the Navy. (Boutelle, Betsey) (fth). (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-2321ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference . Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2022 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/11/2022 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 8/23/2022. (fth) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar