Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01624
Date Filed2022-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning communications sent to or from three named FERC officials and four named White House officials over an eight-month period. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-081COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9294276) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to US Attorney, US Attorney General, and FERC, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-09Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmg) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-103NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-07-114Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-12MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Government shall answer or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint no later than August 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/12/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-08-015ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-016ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 15, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/01/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-157Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
2022-08-16MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by August 18, 2022, which addresses the matters listed in the 6 Order entered on August 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/16/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/18/2022 (zjch, ) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
2022-08-188STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-189Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-08-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 17, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of potential additional responsive records. The parties shall propose a schedule for further proceedings, including production of a pre-briefing Vaughn Index, if Defendant's production is complete by October 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/19/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/17/2022 (zjch, ) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar