Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01652
Date Filed2022-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the leak of data to ProPublica. FGI also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told FGI that its request was too broad to search and closed the request. FGI sent the IRS a letter arguing that its request was not too broad to search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-081COMPLAINT against FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. U.S. Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9293912) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Functional Government Initiative FOIA Request dated February 2, 2022, # 2 Exhibit 2. IRS Interim Response to FOIA dated March 2, 2022, # 3 Exhibit 3. IRS Interim Response to FOIA dated May 17, 2022, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 6 Summons IRS Chief Counsel, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goeken, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-09Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-07-183Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-07-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to August 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 21, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-194ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-195STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 19, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-22MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 19, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request[s] and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's request[s] can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 22, 2022. (LCCJN1) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
2022-09-196Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 6 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report by November 5, 2022, and every 60 days thereafter until either party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 26, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar