Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGriego et al v. United States Forest Service
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2022cv00434
Date Filed2022-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza
PlaintiffPatrick Griego
PlaintiffLeo Pacheco
PlaintiffAnnabelle Pacheco
PlaintiffAdelaido Trujillo
PlaintiffGenerose Trujillo
PlaintiffJuan Ortiz
PlaintiffMary Ortiz
PlaintiffSamantha Ortiz
PlaintiffAnita Ortiz
PlaintiffSteven Franken
PlaintiffPamela Abreu
PlaintiffJim Abreu
PlaintiffJonathan Miglin
PlaintiffRobert Bowden
PlaintiffElizabeth Childers
PlaintiffChilders Burns
PlaintiffClark Burns
PlaintiffEdna Burns
PlaintiffLoretta Chavez
PlaintiffRobert Chavez
PlaintiffDaniel Encinias
PlaintiffLori Anne Encinias
PlaintiffElizabeth Esquibel
PlaintiffMark Esquibel
PlaintiffCynthia Hollis
PlaintiffWalter Hughes
PlaintiffSharron Hughes
PlaintiffAlexander Kwan
PlaintiffFiachna Rose
PlaintiffErica Larsen
PlaintiffTyler White
PlaintiffHerman Lujan
PlaintiffLorraine Lujan
PlaintiffTheodore Lujan
PlaintiffLorenzo Lujan
PlaintiffDennis Rivera
PlaintiffFelicia Rivera
PlaintiffMartin Sandoval
PlaintiffDonata Sena
PlaintiffMaria Sena
PlaintiffBreena Tafoya
PlaintiffLawrence Tafoya
PlaintiffGeorge Trujillo
PlaintiffDiane Trujillo
PlaintiffEloy Roybal
PlaintiffAnita Roybal
PlaintiffPauline Espinoza
PlaintiffRandy Espinoza
PlaintiffDolores Espinoza
PlaintiffPedro Romero
PlaintiffValerie Romero
Case DescriptionPatrick Greigo and a number of other requesters submitted FOIA requests to the U.S. Forest Service for records concerning plans and modifications to plans authorizing the described burn that led to the Hermit's Peak Fire of April 6, 2022. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Greigo and the other requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Forest Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-081COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Patrick Griego. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Weisman, Cynthia) Modified on 6/8/2022 (jg). (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-082APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Patrick Griego (Weisman, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-08United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-083PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-09Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8310727 re 1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer, Complaint filed by Patrick Griego (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Weisman, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-094CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Patrick Griego voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Weisman, Cynthia) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-09Summons Issued as to United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar