Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01656
Date Filed2022-06-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffCENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Center to Advance Security in America submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's 2021 annual report. CASA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing further from the agency, CASA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9295363) filed by CENTER TO ADVANCE SECURITY IN AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons ICE Summons, # 3 Summons DHS Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty Summons, # 5 Summons AG Summons, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-10Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zmh) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-102SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-07-123NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/23/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/23/2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General June 27, 2022. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/24/2022; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 6/24/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service (DHS))(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-257ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-268ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by August 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 26, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-08-099Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
2022-08-1410SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall file a joint status report on 9/9/22. See document for more details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 14, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 08/14/2022)
2022-09-0811Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report and by the agreement of the Parties, the Court amends its August 14, 2022 order and directs the Parties to file a joint status report on November 9, 2022 and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 9, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 09/09/2022)
2022-09-09Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report due by November 9, 2022. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 09/09/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar