Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01657
Date Filed2022-06-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionThe American Center for Law and Justice submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the establishment of the Disinformation Governance Board. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-091COMPLAINT by Plaintiff ACLJ against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9295672) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, Plaintiff's FOIA letter to Defendant DHS, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, proof of delivery to Defendant DHS, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons to DHS, # 5 Summons to US Attorney General, # 6 Summons to US Attorney for DC)(Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-093NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)
2022-06-13Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-134SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/23/22. (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2022)
2022-06-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/22/2022 (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2022)
2022-06-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/27/2022. (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-258NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-259Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-27MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 9 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by August 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/27/22. (DJS) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/3/2022. (tb) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-0310MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-0311NOTICE of Appearance by John Monaghan on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Monaghan, John) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-1712Memorandum in opposition to re 10 Motion to Dismiss filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Order Proposed Order)(Monaghan, John) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-2413REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar