Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOORKEY v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01648
Date Filed2022-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffTEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY
Case DescriptionTehmton Nariman Toorkey submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed records but redacted some records under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Toorkey filed an administrative appeal. Toorkey then filed a complaint with the Office of Government Information Services. OGIS said it could not open a case on his complaint. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Toorkey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-071COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202328) filed by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(zeg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-072MOTION for CM/ECF Password by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY. (zeg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-10SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (zeg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-143STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 14, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-144ORDER DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's 2 request for "leave of Court to file Motion to e-file for review." See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 14, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-265NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY (zeg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-276SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-07-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/8/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/8/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/7/2022.) (zed) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of plaintiff's 5 New Pro Se Consent to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing, plaintiff to file a motion that complies with Local Civil Rule 5.4(b)(2), which governs motions of pro se parties to file electronically and consent to electronic service. If plaintiff wishes to file electronically and consent to electronic service, he "must file a written motion entitled 'Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password,' describing the party's access to the internet, confirming the capacity to file documents and receive filings electronically on a regular basis, and certifying that he... either has successfully completed the entire Clerk's Office on-line tutorial or has been permitted to file electronically in other federal courts." LCvR 5.4(b)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 4, 2022. (lbah3) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-098MOTION for CM/ECF Password by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY. (zed) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
2022-08-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, upon consideration of plaintiff's representations and compliance with D.D.C. LCvR 5.4(b)(2), plaintiff's 8 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 12, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/12/2022)
2022-08-229MOTION to Issue Subpoena by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY. (Attachment: # 1 Subpoenas)(zed) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, by August 31, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. The 1 Complaint was filed on June 7, 2022, and defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services was served on July 8, 2022, see 7 Return of Service/Affidavit, making defendant's answer due August 7, 2022, but no answer or other response has been timely filed and no other action has been taken in the case. Failure to comply with this order may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 24, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to the Court's Show Cause Order due by 8/31/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-2610NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-2611MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-2713MOTION for Withdrawal of Minute Order re Order, by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY. (zed) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-2714RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc filed by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY. (zed) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the government's 11 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc , DIRECTING the government to respond to the 1 Complaint by September 26, 2022, and DENYING the plaintiff's 9 Motion to Issue Subpoenas because the use of subpoenas to obtain the object of the plaintiff's FOIA request is improper, including because discovery is generally not permitted in FOIA litigation. See Cole v. Rochford , 285 F. Supp. 3d 73, 76 (D.D.C. 2018) ("It is well established that discovery is rare in FOIA cases."). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 29, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 9/26/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-08-2912RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order, filed by TEHMTON NARIMAN TOORKEY. "Leave to file GRANTED" Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 8/29/2022. (zed) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISCHARGING, upon consideration of the government's 11 Motion for Extension of Time and plaintiff's 12 Response to Order to Show Cause, the Court's August 24, 2022 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 2, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-2615ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar