Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleATLANTIC MONTHLY GROUP LLC et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01675
Date Filed2022-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffATLANTIC MONTHLY GROUP LLC
PlaintiffCAITLIN H. DICKERSON
Case DescriptionAtlantic Monthly reporter Caitlin Dickerson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning duty log entries from the El Paso office of the Western District of Texas from July 2017 to July 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Atlantic Monthly filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-101COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9301623) filed by The Atlantic Monthly Group LLC, Caitlin H. Dickerson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Handman, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-102NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Rose Handman on behalf of Caitlin H. Dickerson, The Atlantic Monthly Group LLC (Handman, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-103LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Emerson Collective and Bradley Media Holdings, Inc.) by The Atlantic Monthly Group LLC (Handman, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to laurahandman@dwt.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-134REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to United States Department of Justice, filed by ATLANTIC MONTHLY GROUP LLC, CAITLIN H. DICKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons directed to United States Attorney General, # 2 Summons directed to U.S. Attorney's Office for District of Columbia)(Handman, Laura) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-135ERRATA by ATLANTIC MONTHLY GROUP LLC, CAITLIN H. DICKERSON re 1 Complaint filed by ATLANTIC MONTHLY GROUP LLC, CAITLIN H. DICKERSON. (Handman, Laura) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-06-14Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmh) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-146SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/15/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Exhibit Certified Receipt_U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Affidavit US Department of Justice, # 4 Exhibit Certified Receipt_US Department of Justice)(Handman, Laura) Modified text and deadline on 6/23/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 06/23/2022)
2022-06-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/15/2022. (ztth) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar