Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-06-13 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Executive Office for United States Attorneys filed by Joshua Blanchard (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2022) |
2022-06-13 | | FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Joshua Blanchard in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6766311 (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2022) |
2022-06-13 | 2 | PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2022) |
2022-06-14 | 3 | NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (jrg) (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-06-14 | 4 | SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Executive Office for United States Attorneys, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jrg) (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-06-16 | 5 | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 22-CA-049 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (jrg) (Entered: 06/17/2022) |
2022-06-29 | 6 | SUMMONS returned executed on Executive Office for United States Attorneys, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Executive Office for United States Attorneys complete on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Return Receipts) (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2022) |
2022-07-27 | 7 | ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 07/27/2022) |
2022-07-27 | 8 | ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip J. Green; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 07/27/2022) |
2022-08-04 | 9 | ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/4/2022 at 02:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 9/29/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 08/04/2022) |
2022-09-28 | 10 | JOINT STATUS REPORT regarding Rule 16 conference (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 09/28/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 11 | NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for October 4, 2022; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/17/2022 at 03:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; (jkw) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-17 | 12 | MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of Rule 16 scheduling conference; CMO to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald) (Entered: 10/18/2022) |
2022-10-18 | 13 | INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald) (Entered: 10/18/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 14 | MOTION for leave to file amended complaint by plaintiff Joshua Blanchard; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Proposed First Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 15 | CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file amended complaint 14 filed by Joshua Blanchard (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2023-01-10 | 16 | (WITHDRAWN) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file amended complaint 14 filed by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) Modified text on 3/14/2023 - withdrawn per 26 (slk). (Entered: 01/10/2023) |
2023-01-10 | 17 | CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition 16 to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/10/2023) |
2023-01-18 | 18 | NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number 14 : motion hearing is set for 1/30/2023 at 10:00 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; (jkw) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-01-30 | 19 | MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green f motion hearing re 14 MOTION for leave to file amended complaint filed by Joshua Blanchard; motion held in abeyance; notice of status conference to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-30 | 20 | ORDER holding in abeyance 14 motion for leave to file; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-30 | 21 | NOTICE of status conference set for 3/6/2023 at 03:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 22 | NOTICE re 21 Plaintiff's Administrative Appeal by defendant Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 23 | (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Zoom Link [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Joshua Blanchard, Executive Office for United States Attorneys only] (ald) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 24 | NOTICE rescheduling hearing: status conference set for 3/14/2023 at 10:00 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; (ald) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 25 | NOTICE re 20 regarding status of administrative appeal by plaintiff Joshua Blanchard (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Decision on Administrative Appeal) (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 26 | WITHDRAWAL by defendant Executive Office for United States Attorneys of Response in Opposition 16 filed by Executive Office for United States Attorneys Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 27 | MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of status conference; order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 28 | ORDER granting 14 motion for leave to file amended complaint; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 29 | ORDER setting briefing schedule: Answer to the amended complaint due 3/28/2023; dispositive Motion deadline 4/13/2023; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 30 | AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed per 28 ) against Executive Office for United States Attorneys filed by Joshua Blanchard (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (mg) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-03-28 | 31 | Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint 30 with affirmative defenses by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/28/2023) |
2023-04-13 | 32 | DECLARATION of Auborn Finney by defendant Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Vaughn Index, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit C - EOUSA's response letters) (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
2023-05-29 | 33 | MOTION for summary judgment by plaintiff Joshua Blanchard; (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2023) |
2023-06-28 | 34 | MOTION for summary judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion by defendant Executive Office for United States Attorneys; (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/28/2023) |
2023-06-28 | 35 | BRIEF in support of MOTION for summary judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion 34 filed by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/28/2023) |
2023-06-28 | 36 | CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion 35 for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/28/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 37 | RESPONSE TO MOTION for summary judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion 34 filed by Joshua Blanchard (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-31 | 38 | MOTION for leave to file out of time by plaintiff Joshua Blanchard; (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023) |
2023-07-31 | 39 | CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file out of time 38 filed by Joshua Blanchard (Blanchard, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023) |
2023-08-02 | 40 | ORDER granting 38 motion for leave to file brief out of time; Reply brief due within seven days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 41 | RESPONSE TO MOTION for summary judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion 34 , MOTION for summary judgment 33 Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 42 | CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion, 41 filed by Executive Office for United States Attorneys (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2024-01-03 | 43 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 33 and 34 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 01/03/2024) |
2024-01-19 | 44 | ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 43 , Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 33 is DENIED, Defendant's motion for summary judgment 34 is GRANTED; Count 1 of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED; this matter is TERMINATED; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-01-19 | 45 | JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant as to Count II of the Amended Complaint; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |