Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTUDENT FREE PRESS ASSOCIATION et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01713
Date Filed2022-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffSTUDENT FREE PRESS ASSOCIATION
PlaintiffCHRISTIAN SCHNEIDER
Case DescriptionThe Student Free Press Association submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning emails sent to the Free Speech Hotline, which student journalists could call to report First Amendment violations, since it began operation in December 2020. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency indicated several times that it was processing the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, SFPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9307917) filed by STUDENT FREE PRESS ASSOCIATION, CHRISTIAN SCHNEIDER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons for the agency, the U.S. Department of Education, # 4 Summons for the attorney general)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STUDENT FREE PRESS ASSOCIATION (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-15Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-154STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 15, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/15/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 6/21/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/21/2022. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar