Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01721
Date Filed2022-06-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning how the agency assesses targeted violence, risk management tools, and definitions of key terms used to formulate domestic terrorism frameworks. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the ACLU's request for expedited processing and conditionally granted its request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9310040) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons : Department of Homeland Security, # 4 Summons : U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons : U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-15Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-164MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sana Mayat, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9312755. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sana Mayat, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-16MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of SANA MAYAT. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/16/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-165NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-216NOTICE of Appearance by Sana Mayat on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Mayat, Sana) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/23/2022 (Mayat, Sana); Modified text on 6/30/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-308RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/24/2022. (Mayat, Sana) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-309RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/24/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/24/2022. (Mayat, Sana) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-2210NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-2211MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-22MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 11 Motion for Extension, the Court ORDERS that it shall file such opposition by July 26, 2022. So ORERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/22/2022. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 7/26/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-07-2612RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayat, Sana) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 11 Motion for Extension is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by August 22, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/27/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/22/2022 (nbn) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-2213ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 6, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/22/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/6/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
2022-09-0114Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 14 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 20, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/01/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-1615NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. Attorney Sana Mayat terminated. (Mayat, Sana) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-2016Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 16 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 4, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/20/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-10-0417Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 17 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 4, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/04/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar