Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01733
Date Filed2022-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe American Accountability Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the implementation of E.O. 14019, which requires agencies to take steps to improve voter registration. AAF also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency granted AAF's requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AAF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-161COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9312416) filed by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A:DOJ Req., # 2 Exhibit B:DOJ Acknowlegement, # 3 Exhibit C: BOP Req., # 4 Exhibit D: BOP Acknowledgement, # 5 Exhibit E: USMS Req., # 6 Exhibit F: USMS Acknowledgement, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-16Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-164STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 16, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/17/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/17/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Ex)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/27/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-297RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/21/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-07-138NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-139Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and DIRECTING defendant to respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by August 31, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 14, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/31/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-08-3110ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-09-1411Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 15, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 15, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar