Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01735
Date Filed2022-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe American Accountability Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning calendar entries of various DOJ officials pertaining to their participation in implementing E.O. 14018, which required agencies to take steps to improved voter registration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked for clarification as to some requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, AAF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-161COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9312955) filed by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M, # 2 Exhibit N-Z, # 3 Exhibit AA-MM, # 4 Exhibit NN-ZZ, # 5 Exhibit AAA-GGG, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-16Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/17/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/17/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/23/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/23/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-07-137NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-138Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before August 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/15/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-08-319ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-09-01MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/01/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before November 4, 2022, and every thirty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/19/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar