Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01738
Date Filed2022-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe American Accountability Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between 30 DOJ employees and outside third parties. AAF submitted separate request for each employee. AAF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AAF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9313793) filed by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M, # 2 Exhibit N-Z, # 3 Exhibit AA-MM, # 4 Exhibit NN-ZZ, # 5 Exhibit AAA-GGG, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN ACCOUNTABILITY FOUNDATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-16Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/17/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/17/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/23/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/23/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of K. Robinson w Exs)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-07-137NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-138Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's 8 Unopposed Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by August 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 07/14/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-08-319ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-31MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/31/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar