Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01746
Date Filed2022-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration's Reagan Presidential Library for records concerning the use of surveillance under the Foreign Intelligence Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-171COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9315791) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-4, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-06-172NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-06-173NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-06-21Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmh) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-09-025NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Taylor Knapp on behalf of All Defendants (Knapp, Cody) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-026ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Knapp, Cody) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-027ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 16, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/02/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-168Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Knapp, Cody) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-09-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 15, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/18/2022. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar