Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01750
Date Filed2022-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning DOE employees who attended the 2021 United Nations Climate Change Conference in Glasgow, UK. PPT also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9316124) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA HQ-2022-00164-F, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- U.S. Department of Energy)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-06-21Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-07-203NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-214Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-21MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by or on August 22, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7-21-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-08-225ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule by September 6, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8-22-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-09-066Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report before or on October 6, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9-7-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar