Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01826
Date Filed2022-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffNATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM
Case DescriptionThe National Veterans Legal Services Program submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the blog post from the Assistant Secretary for Public Affairs dated September 20, 2021, entitled Tenth Anniversary of the repeal of the Don't Ask, Don't Tell policy on gays in the military. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NVLSP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9332368) filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stichman, Barton) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-27Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-272SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to bart@nvlsp.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-273LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Stichman, Barton) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/28/2022) (zjm). (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-274REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to US Attorney General and US Attorney's Office re 1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Atty Office)(Stichman, Barton) (Entered: 06/27/2022)
2022-06-285SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 06/28/2022)
2022-08-026NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of All Defendants (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-027Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the 7 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/2/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-09-128Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the 8 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/14/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar