Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDURRANI v. EXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01859
Date Filed2022-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffARIF A. DURRANI
Case DescriptionArif Durrani submitted FOIA requests to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys, the CIA, and the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning his 1986 naturalization and Iran-contra related conviction. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Durrani filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCENTRAL INELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-271COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202467) filed by ARIF A. DURRNI. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zed) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-30SUMMONS Not Issued as to CENTRAL INELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (zed) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-14SUMMONS (5) Issued as to CENTRAL INELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and U.S. Attorney. (zed) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-262STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 26, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-09-023NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of CENTRAL INELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 8/18/2022; EXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 8/15/2022; NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 8/18/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/18/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2022.) (zed) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-094MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICES FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/09/2022)
2022-09-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants' 4 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 12, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar