Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMORRISON URENA, L.C. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01876
Date Filed2022-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffMORRISON URENA, L.C.
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-291COMPLAINT FOIA against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9340261) filed by MORRISON URENA, L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Summons US Attorney, # 5 Summons Department of State, # 6 Summons Garland, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-30Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-073RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/7/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/6/2022 (Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-084ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/08/2022. (DM) (Entered: 07/08/2022)
2022-08-015Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed August 1, 2022. Counsel for Defendant represents that they require additional time to confer with agency counsel before responding to the complaint and, as such, requests an extension of time, from August 1, 2022 to August 22, 2022, to respond to the complaint. As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED . Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before August 22, 2022 . Additionally, the parties are reminded that, per the Courts 4 Order, all requests for extensions of time must be made at least four days prior to the affected deadline. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 2, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/22/2022. (dot) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-246Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-08-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report. Although Defendant's answer was due August 22, 2022, the parties propose to continue filing joint status reports in lieu of Defendant filing an answer. On or before September 2, 2022, Defendant shall file a legal briefing identifying the authority that permits Defendant to forgo filing an answer, or, alternatively, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 24, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a legal briefing identifying the authority that permits Defendant to forgo filing an answer, or, alternatively, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 9/2/2022. (dot) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-09-027ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-068ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before October 4, 2022 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 6, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2022. (dot) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar