Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZaid v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2022cv01602
Date Filed2022-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Deborah K. Chasanow
PlaintiffMark Zaid
Case DescriptionMark Zaid submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning five categories of records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and referred it to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Zaid filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [15]
Opinion/Order [32]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-06-291COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10021822.), filed by MARK ZAID. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAMD)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-292MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address in Violation of LCVR 102.2(a) by MARK ZAID (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-303Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-304NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Mark Zaid or counsel for Mark Zaid are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/14/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-06-305Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 6/30/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-156ORDER directing Mark Zaid to show cause for failure to comply with Standing Order 2019-07 . Show Cause Hearing set for 7/29/2022 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Mark Zaid files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 7/15/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-158PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: 6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 7/15/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-15Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
2022-07-219SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Zaid. Department of Homeland Security served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/21/2022)
2022-07-2210NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Leigh Shelton on behalf of Department of Homeland Security (Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-2711Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-07-2712PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 11 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's complaint is due September 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/27/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-09-0813MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-0814PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 13 motion for extension of time. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's complaint is due November 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/8/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
2022-09-2315MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/23/2022. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-2316ORDER GRANTING 2 motion for leave to file complaint using Counsel's address. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/23/2022. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-11-0317MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2022-11-0318PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 17 motion for extension of time. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's complaint is due January 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/3/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 11/03/2022)
2023-01-0519MOTION for Other Relief To Establish Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 01/05/2023)
2023-01-0620PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 19 motion to establish summary judgment briefing schedule and reminding counsel to coordinate with each other regarding the filing of motions for summary judgment (see Local Rule 105.2.c). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/6/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
2023-02-1021Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-1322PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 21 consent motion to modify briefing schedule. The first party's motion for summary judgment is due by March 23, the opposing party's opposition is due by April 6, and the first party's reply is due by April 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/13/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-03-2323MOTION for Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 03/23/2023)
2023-04-0324Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Mark Zaid (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/03/2023)
2023-04-0425PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 24 consent motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to 23 motion for summary judgment is due by April 20 and Defendant's reply is due by May 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/4/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-04-2026RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Zaid. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mark Zaid, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Bradley P. Moss, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
2023-05-0227Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 05/02/2023)
2023-05-0328PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 27 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant's reply to 23 motion for summary judgment is due by May 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/3/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 05/03/2023)
2023-05-1129Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-1130PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 29 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant's reply to 23 motion for summary judgment is due by May 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/11/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-1231REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-07-0532MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/5/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-0533ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 23 motion for summary judgment, ENTERING judgment against Plaintiff Mark Zaid and in favor of the Department of Homeland Security on the portion of Count One with regard to the adequacy of the search by USSS and as to the request for documents related to "Hurtcore" addressed to ICE, GRANTING the motion for summary judgment filed in DKC 21-1130 at ECF No. 18, and ENTERING judgment in Civil Action No. DKC 21-1130 against Plaintiff Mark Zaid and in favor of the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/5/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-08-0934PAPERLESS NOTICE SCHEDULING a telephone conference with counsel on Friday, September 8, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-09-08Telephone Conference held on 9/8/2023 before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-0835LETTER/ORDER CONFIRMING the matters discussed with counsel during the telephone conference. A status report will be filed by December 1 and a telephone conference with counsel will be held December 8 at 9:15 a.m. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/8/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-11-3036STATUS REPORT by Department of Homeland Security(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-3037PAPERLESS ORDER THANKING counsel for 36 status report and APPROVING the parties' request to extend the schedule. A status report is due by January 16, 2024, and a telephone conference with counsel will be held January 23, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/30/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar