Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01919
Date Filed2022-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJason Leopold submitted a FOIA requests to the CIA and the National Security Agency for records concerning the removal of presidential records from Mar-a-Lago. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-011COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9345491) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-7, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-012SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JASON LEOPOLD(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-013NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-014NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-075SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-08-266AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-9, # 2 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-09-197NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Heiman on behalf of All Defendants (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-198ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-20MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than November 1, 2022 . The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/20/2022. (lcss) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-219RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 7/21/2022 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-2110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/21/2022. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar