Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01920
Date Filed2022-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Criminal Division and National Security Division for records concerning presidential records removed from Mar-a-Lago. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9345626) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-012SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JASON LEOPOLD(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-013NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-014NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-05Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-075SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-09-196NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Heiman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-197ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by October 4, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/20/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/4/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/21/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/20/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-2210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/18/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar