Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01921
Date Filed2022-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the removal of presidential records from Mar-a-Lago. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding) and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods or techniques). Leopold filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-011COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9345822) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-012SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JASON LEOPOLD(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-013NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-014NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-05Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-055SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-056STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 5, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar