Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01922
Date Filed2022-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning an inventory of records submitted to NARA by the Trump administration that were damaged. Leopold also submitted a FOIA to NARA for a copy of the inspector general's report on the removal of presidential records from Mar-a-Lago. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-011COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9345930) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-9, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-012SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JASON LEOPOLD(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-013NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-014NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-055SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-056STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/5/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-09-197NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Joseph Wynosky on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Wynosky, Kevin) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-198ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Wynosky, Kevin) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-20MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before October 18, 2022, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 25, 2022, at 9:00 a.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/20/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 7/8/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-2210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/21/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-09-2211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/18/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar