Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. U.S. SECRET SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01923
Date Filed2022-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning the removal of presidential records from Mar-a-Lago. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-011COMPLAINT against U.S. SECRET SERVICE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9346085) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) Modified on 7/1/2022 to correct filers.(ztnr). (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-012SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JASON LEOPOLD(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-013NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-014NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-055SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-056STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/5/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-09-067NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Heiman on behalf of All Defendants (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-068ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE.(Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-16MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before October 17, 2022, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 24, 2022, at 9:00 a.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/16/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar