Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleChisholm Chisholm &Kilpatrick LTD v. McDonough
DistrictDistrict of Rhode Island
CityProvidence
Case Number1:2022cv00257
Date Filed2022-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Mary S. McElroy
PlaintiffChisholm Chisholm &Kilpatrick LTD
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Chisholm Chisholm & Kilpatrick submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the Board's Case Assignment Algorithm. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDenis McDonough Secretary of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-07-011COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1773549 ), filed by Chisholm Chisholm &Kilpatrick LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 VA summons)(Kilpatrick, J.) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-01Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-012CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-013Summons Issued as to Denis McDonough. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-064Summons Request filed by Chisholm Chisholm &Kilpatrick LTD. (Kilpatrick, J.) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-065Summons Request filed by Chisholm Chisholm &Kilpatrick LTD. (Kilpatrick, J.) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-066Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-257AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Chisholm Chisholm &Kilpatrick LTD . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of service on VA, # 2 Exhibit Proof of service on AUSA RI)(Kilpatrick, J.) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-08-028CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chisholm Chisholm &Kilpatrick LTD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of service on Atty Gen)(Kilpatrick, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-109ANSWER to Complaint by Denis McDonough.(Rogers, Mary) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
2022-09-1410REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kilpatrick, J.) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
2022-09-2011PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 1/3/2023; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 2/3/2023; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/3/2023; Expert Discovery to close by 4/3/2023; Motions due by 5/3/2023;. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 9/20/2022. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar